skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 5:19:51 AM

Lalonde, Benjamin David

CPSO#: 93211

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40A Couchie Industrial Rd
North Bay ON  P1B 8G5
Phone: 705-495-1580
Fax: 705-495-0133 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

142 Main Street East
North Bay ON  P1B 1A8
Canada
Phone: 705-223-8225
Fax: 705-223-4372
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin David Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lalonde ( CPSO# 93211 )

Business Address:
142 Main Street East
North Bay ON  P1B 1A8
Phone Number: (705) 223-8225

Business Address:
40 Couchie Industrial Road
Suite A
North Bay ON  P1B 8G5
Phone Number: (705) 853-3110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN DAVID LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012