skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:46:48 AM

Sharaf, Amy Adel

CPSO#: 93040

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Ave. E., Suite 510
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: 416-431-4402
Fax: 416-431-0762 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

328 Highway 7 E., suite 301
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Canada
Phone: 905-771-8821
Fax: 905-771-8481
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

VIRCAN
328 Highway 7 E., suite 301
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Canada
Phone: 905-771-8821
Fax: 905-771-8481
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

VIRCAN
187 St. Clair Ave West, Floor 1
Toronto ON  M4V 1P7
Canada
Phone: 416-922-6022
Fax: 416-927-9100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Chronic Diseases Clinic
2330 Kennedy Road, suite 210
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Canada
Phone: 416-335-1717
Fax: 416-335-1719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amy Sharaf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharaf ( CPSO# 93040 )

Business Address:
Toronto Chronic Disease Centre
2330 Kennedy Road
Suite 210
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 335-1717

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY ADEL SHARAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014