skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 8:40:37 PM

Beaudoin, Emily Patricia Irene

CPSO#: 92989

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 15 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Nov 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 19 Nov 2018 to 13 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2019