skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:12:35 AM

Anderson, Kelly Christine

CPSO#: 92885

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Bond Street Health Centre
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone: (416) 864-3011
Fax: (416) 864-3099 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

325 Front Street West, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5V 2Y1
Canada
Phone: (647) 497 7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Anderson ( CPSO# 92885 )

Business Address:
80 Bond Street Health Centre
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3011


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KELLY CHRISTINE ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2013