skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 10:08:25 PM

Dalvi, Anil Ashok

CPSO#: 92799

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: 905-635-7302 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANIL ASHOK DALVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015