skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:52:08 PM

Alonso Esteve, Angela

CPSO#: 92513

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad De La Laguna, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 23 May 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011