skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/09/2019 12:39:02 PM

AlHarbi, Nasser Saleh T

CPSO#: 92473

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2010 to 25 Apr 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2012