skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 4:30:33 PM

Al Daoud, Najla Helmi Rashid

CPSO#: 92378

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Baghdad, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 11 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011