skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 2:59:39 PM

Lopez Diez, Juan Cruz

CPSO#: 92137

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universitario de Ciencias de la Salud, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 25 Sep 2009 to 03 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 04 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010