skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 5:02:16 AM

Al Belushi, Farida Wali Mohammed Haibatan

CPSO#: 92101

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 31 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 01 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2011