skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 4:36:58 AM

Mariano, Caroline Joy

CPSO#: 92095

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2009 to 18 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2012