skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 3:48:32 AM

Cuffe, Sinead Delores

CPSO#: 91759

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2013