skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/04/2019 8:46:17 PM

Leblanc, Yvan

CPSO#: 91689

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury And District
General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-631-1111
Fax: 613-636-6175 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Y. Leblanc Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Leblanc ( CPSO# 91689 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YVAN LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014