skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 3:59:32 AM

Welk, Blayne Kaili

CPSO#: 91638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
Room B4 667
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6367
Fax: (519) 646-6037 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Blayne Welk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Welk ( CPSO# 91638 )
Dr. A. Zorzi ( CPSO# 87741 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Hospital
Room B4 667
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BLAYNE KAILI WELK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009