skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:46:34 PM

Lapidot Tal, Guy

CPSO#: 91534

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011