skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 6:20:56 PM

Thomas, Nell

CPSO#: 91096

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Minden Site
Box 700
6 McPherson Road
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone: (705) 286-2500
Fax: (705) 286-2022 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Suke ( CPSO# 93397 )
Dr. N. Thomas ( CPSO# 91096 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. D. Gilmour ( CPSO# 100637)
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212


Corporation Name: Dr. Nell Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Thomas ( CPSO# 91096 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Minden Site
Box 700
6 McPherson Road
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NELL THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011