skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 4:32:19 AM

Nafisi, Houman

CPSO#: 90496

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2017