skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 11:50:54 AM

Kraft, Claudia Suzanne

CPSO#: 90495

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2009 to 12 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2015