skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 9:56:54 PM

Dixit, Radhika

CPSO#: 90487

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone: 9058938085 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Radhika Dixit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dixit ( CPSO# 90487 )

Business Address:
Woodbridge Medical Centre
A13 - 9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone Number: (905) 893-8085

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RADHIKA DIXIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012