skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 3:56:53 PM

Trinos, Baieruss M

CPSO#: 90449

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Citrus Medical Centre
605 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 4G5
Phone: (416) 800-6500
Fax: (416) 342-1790 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: (519) 941-7025
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
Sinai Health System
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8252 Ext. 3700
Fax: (416) 470-6722
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Baieruss Trinos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trinos ( CPSO# 90449 )

Business Address:
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BAIERUSS M TRINOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011