skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/04/2019 12:04:07 PM

Linkletter, Martha Lynn

CPSO#: 90351

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Fax: (519) 804-9785 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Linkletter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linkletter ( CPSO# 90351 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTHA LYNN LINKLETTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINKLETTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 13 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Adolescent Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2012 to 14 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013