skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:17:49 PM

Kulkarni, Ashwin Govind

CPSO#: 90287

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shivaji University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2009 to 28 May 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 29 May 2009 to 15 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2009