skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:18:49 PM

Jilani, Tariq Lutfi Abdurabalrasool

CPSO#: 90260

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 10 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Apr 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010