skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 9:59:34 PM

Rodriguez, Amadeo Raul

CPSO#: 90083

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Dec 2008
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Ambulatory Health Ctr
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-7777 Ext. 38052
Fax: (905) 573-4858 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton Street East
(Hamilton General Hospital)
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46755
Fax: (905) 577-8016
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amadeo Raul Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rodriguez ( CPSO# 90083 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Ambulatory Health Care
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Dec 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014 Active
             1.    Dr. Amadeo Raul Rodriguez may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Ophthalmology,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr.
                        Rodriguez  holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires when Dr. Rodriguez
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.