skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/04/2019 11:55:34 AM

Viola, Nicola

CPSO#: 89822

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universita di Verona, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009