skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 10:46:49 PM

Kazmi, Syed Rehan Mohammed

CPSO#: 89797

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2011