skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:16:07 PM

Sobieraj-Teague, Magdalena

CPSO#: 89755

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Adelaide, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 16 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 17 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010