skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:41:11 AM

Murphy, Desmond Michael

CPSO#: 89713

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009