skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/04/2019 8:05:23 PM

Wolkoff, David Andrew

CPSO#: 89688

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilfrid Laurier University
Student Wellness Centre
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone: (519) 884-0710 Ext. 3146 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-1010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

University of Waterloo
Student Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G5
Canada
Phone: (519) 888-4567 Ext. 31976
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wolkoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wolkoff ( CPSO# 89688 )

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
Wilfrid Laurier University
Student Wellness Centre
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 884-0710

Business Address:
University of Waterloo
Student Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2L 3G5
Phone Number: (519) 888-4567


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona

USA - Hawaii

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW WOLKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLKOFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008