skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:16:45 AM

Khawaja, Saba Zahoor

CPSO#: 89371

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: Ul Haq, Saba Zahoor (used until: 15 Dec 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ZMC Medical Centre
Unit 2
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone: (905) 427-5444
Fax: (905) 427-6444 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SABA ZAHOOR KHAWAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAWAJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2014