skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/04/2019 8:40:57 PM

Cheng Oviedo, Sonia Gabriela

CPSO#: 89349

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011