skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 4:47:50 PM

Singh, Mandeep

CPSO#: 89092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room MCL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5118 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mandeep Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Singh ( CPSO# 89092 )

Business Address:
Room MCL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANDEEP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013