skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 5:22:47 AM

Jesmin, Rownak Sultana

CPSO#: 89050

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3376
Fax: (905) 5922325 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Jesmin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jesmin ( CPSO# 89050 )

Business Address:
Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3374

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROWNAK SULTANA JESMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JESMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2011