skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 10:02:32 AM

Kalechstein, Sara Margaret

CPSO#: 88938

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sara Kalechstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 25 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 101 1617 Baker Street Cranbrook, BC V1C 1B4
Date Received: 11 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2014