skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 6:37:57 PM

Nicholson, Marcia Ann

CPSO#: 88864

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Hill Medical Centre
Unit 20
1 Spadina Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M2
Phone: 905-237-8628
Fax: 905-237-8618 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARCIA ANN NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011