skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 3:12:09 PM

Heyn, Chinthaka

CPSO#: 88810

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480 6100 Ext. 89952 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019
Corporation Name: Dr. Chinthaka Heyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHINTHAKA HEYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014