skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 6:41:57 PM

Tsang, Melanie Elizabeth

CPSO#: 88638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building, Suite 215
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6818
Fax: (416) 915-5205 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melanie Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tsang ( CPSO# 88638 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph`s Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building, Suite 215
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6818

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE ELIZABETH TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013