skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/07/2019 8:26:43 PM

Craw, Lindsey Ann

CPSO#: 88493

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 110
Oakville ON  L6M1M1
Phone: 289-835-2213
Fax: 289-715-2213 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-4120
Fax: 905-813-4128
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L.A. Craw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Craw ( CPSO# 88493 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
2701 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 2N6
Phone Number: (905) 417-1683

Business Address:
57 Main Street South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3Y5
Phone Number: (905) 953-9772

Business Address:
110 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 835-2213

Business Address:
301 - 2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-9798

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDSEY ANN CRAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012