skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 8:52:17 PM

Rhodes, Bronwen Jane

CPSO#: 88181

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 19 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 May 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009