skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 5:59:06 PM

Maleki, Babak

CPSO#: 88060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1033 Bay St, suite 309
Toronto ON  M5S3A5
Phone: (416) 962-5005
Fax: (416) 962-5856 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1033 Bay Street, suite 309
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5S 3A5
Canada
Phone: 416-962-5005
Fax: 416-962-5856
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9080 Yonge Street, level 2, unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C0Y7
Canada
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Maleki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Maleki ( CPSO# 88060 )

Business Address:
1033 Bay Street
Suite 309
Toronto ON  M5S 3A5
Phone Number: (416) 962-5005

Business Address:
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2 Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BABAK MALEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Jan 2008 to 01 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 02 Feb 2008 to 15 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013