skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:09:18 PM

Hudson, Neil Craig

CPSO#: 87911

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4517
Fax: (705) 7431449 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neil C. Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 26 2009
Corporation Name: Dr. N.C. Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hudson ( CPSO# 87911 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4517

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEIL CRAIG HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007