skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/04/2019 12:08:24 PM

Morariu, Alin Ioan

CPSO#: 87739

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hazeldean Medical Clinic
Suite 203
436 Hazeldean Road
Kanata ON  K2L 1T9
Phone: (613) 369-8330
Fax: (613) 836-6882 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Morariu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morariu ( CPSO# 87739 )

Business Address:
Hazeldean Medical Clinic
436 Hazeldean Road
Suite 203
Kanata ON  K2L 1T9
Phone Number: (613) 369-8330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALIN IOAN MORARIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORARIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2007 to 24 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008