skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:19:27 AM

Vanleeuwen, Jennifer Frances

CPSO#: 66510

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-743-2121 Ext. 5038 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vanleeuwen Lingertat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lingertat ( CPSO# 66528 )
Dr. J. Vanleeuwen ( CPSO# 66510 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Minden Hospital
6 McPherson Street
Box 30
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-2288

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER FRANCES VANLEEUWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANLEEUWEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995