skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 10:46:21 PM

Panzini, Henriette

CPSO#: 59253

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor Office
Suite 15
2575 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Phone: (905) 820-3310
Fax: (905) 820-3312 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Panzini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Panzini ( CPSO# 59253 )

Business Address:
MCI The Doctor Office
2575 Dundas Street West
Suite 15
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Phone Number: (905) 820-3310

Medical Records Location

Address: 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Contact Dina Phone: 1-800-775-0093 Phone: 416-471-8649
Date Received: 02 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 15 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HENRIETTE PANZINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANZINI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988