skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 4:46:53 AM

Hamilton, Paul Anthony

CPSO#: 55254

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 May 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4354
Fax: (416) 480-5855 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul A. Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. M. Hamilton ( CPSO# 33786 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4354


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL ANTHONY HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1985