skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 9:01:29 PM

Entwistle, Catherine Marie Anne

CPSO#: 53944

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kilborn Medical Centre
1385 Bank Street
Suite 402
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 739-0074
Fax: (613) 739-0946 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Entwistle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Entwistle ( CPSO# 53944 )

Business Address:
Kilborn Medical Centre
1385 Bank Street
Suite 402
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 739-0074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE ANNE ENTWISTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENTWISTLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985