skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/04/2019 12:18:10 PM

Arsenian, Jirair Hagop

CPSO#: 41700

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 26-Apr-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French

Education:American University of Beirut, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1991