skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 5:03:23 PM

Ng Wong Hing, France

CPSO#: 41443

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: France Ng Wong Hing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Dresden Community Health Care Centre 530 Tecumseh St Dresden, ON N0P 1M0
Date Received: 04 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018