skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/07/2019 8:16:38 PM

Ivan, Leslie Paul

CPSO#: 41130

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Aug 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sciences,Debrecen, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 1994