skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:24:50 AM

Groll, Aubrey

CPSO#: 41094

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2009